VA SB368 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education preparation programs; reading specialists; dyslexia. Requires each education preparation program offered by a public institution of higher education or private institution of higher education that leads to a degree, concentration, or certificate for reading specialists to include a program of coursework or other training in the identification of and the appropriate interventions, accommodations, and teaching techniques for students with dyslexia or a related disorder. The bill requires such programs to (i) include coursework in the constructs and pedagogy underlying remediation of reading, spelling, and writing and (ii) require reading specialists to demonstrate mastery of an evidence-based, structured literacy instructional approach that includes explicit, systematic, sequential, and cumulative instruction. This bill is identical to HB 1265.
Title
Education preparation programs; reading specialists, dyslexia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 588 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB368ER) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Title replaced 18107508D-H1 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB368H1 |
2018-03-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107508D-H1 |
2018-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107508D-H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103163D |