VA SB366 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB366
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; learning management system. Directs the Department of Education to obtain a statewide learning management system for use in public schools by the start of the 2022-2023 school year.
Title
Learning management system; Department of Education to obtain for public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-28 | House | Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101947D |
Same As/Similar To
SB366 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote