VA SB362 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB362

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Veterans Services; hyperbaric oxygen therapy; data collection. Allows the Department of Veterans Services (the Department) to contract with any hospital in the Commonwealth that furnishes the treatment option of hyperbaric oxygen therapy to provide hyperbaric oxygen therapy to any veteran in the Commonwealth who has been certified by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs or any branch of the United States Armed Forces as having post-traumatic stress disorder or traumatic brain injury. The Department shall include in any contract with such hospital to furnish hyperbaric oxygen therapy the requirement that data be collected to assess the efficacy of hyperbaric oxygen therapy for veterans and any other information deemed relevant by the Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hyperbaric oxygen therapy; data collection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in General Laws
2020-02-27HouseContinued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
2020-02-25HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-15SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101950D

Same As/Similar To

SB362 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback