VA SB353 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB353
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Outdoor shooting ranges; prohibited adjacent to residential areas; exceptions; civil penalty. Prohibits the operation of an outdoor shooting range, defined in the bill, within 500 yards of any property zoned for residential use unless the Range Design Criteria developed by the U.S. Department of Energy, Office of Health, Safety and Security have been met. The bill provides that any person who violates the provisions of this section is subject to a civil penalty of not less than $1,000 nor more than $100,000 for the initial violation and $5,000 per day for each day of violation thereafter.
Title
Outdoor shooting ranges; prohibited adjacent to residential areas, exceptions, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20106330D-S1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102617D |
Same As/Similar To
SB353 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (12-Y 0-N)