VA SB352 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Paid sick leave; health care providers and grocery store workers. Requires employers to provide paid sick leave to health care providers and grocery store workers. Under current law, employers are only required to provide paid sick leave to certain home health workers. The bill removes requirements that workers work on average at least 20 hours per week or 90 hours per month to be eligible for paid sick leave. The bill provides that certain health care providers may waive their right to accrue and use paid sick leave and provides an exemption for certain other health care providers. The bill requires the Department of Labor and Industry to develop guidelines for retail employers that sell groceries to provide sick leave and to publish such guidelines by December 1, 2022. The provisions of the bill other than the requirement for the Department of Labor and Industry to develop guidelines have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act. Paid sick leave; health care providers and grocery store workers. Requires employers to provide paid sick leave to health care providers and grocery store workers. Under current law, employers are only required to provide paid sick leave to certain home health workers. The bill removes requirements that workers work on average at least 20 hours per week or 90 hours per month to be eligible for paid sick leave. The bill provides that certain health care providers may waive their right to accrue and use paid sick leave and provides an exemption for certain other health care providers. The bill requires the Department of Labor and Industry to develop guidelines for retail employers that sell groceries to provide sick leave and to publish such guidelines by December 1, 2022. The provisions of the bill other than the requirement for the Department of Labor and Industry to develop guidelines have a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Health care providers and grocery store workers, etc.; employers to provide paid sick leave, clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22106064D-ES1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB352ES1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106064D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106064D-S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Labor and Employment |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102116D |