VA SB352 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB352
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Guardianship and conservatorship; supported decision-making alternative. Requires a guardian ad litem in a proceeding for the appointment of a guardian or conservator to include in his report to the court information as to whether a supported decision-making agreement, as defined in the bill, is a viable option in lieu of guardianship or conservatorship. Guardianship and conservatorship; supported decision-making alternative. Requires a guardian ad litem in a proceeding for the appointment of a guardian or conservator to include in his report to the court information as to whether a supported decision-making agreement, as defined in the bill, is a viable option in lieu of guardianship or conservatorship.
Title
Guardianship and conservatorship; supported decision-making alternative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-25 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104218D |
Same As/Similar To
SB352 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote