VA SB346 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB346

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; contractors; boiler and pressure vessel operator license. Creates a two-tiered category of licensure administered by the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation's Board for Contractors for any person who has primary responsibility for maintaining boiler, unfired pressure vessel, and water heater operations in a multifamily dwelling unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractors, on-site superintendents; boiler and pressure vessel operator license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseContinued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
2020-02-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2020-02-21HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-18HouseReferred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N)
2020-01-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB346S1
2020-01-27SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106489D-S1
2020-01-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-27SenateRead second time
2020-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106489D-S1
2020-01-22SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 0-N 3-A)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102016D

Same As/Similar To

SB346 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40151.9:3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback