VA SB344 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sewerage systems; state adoption of federal criteria. Directs the State Water Control Board (the Board) not to adopt certain U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) freshwater ammonia water quality criteria (the Criteria) unless the Board includes in such adoption a phased implementation program consistent with the federal Clean Water Act with certain funding and timing considerations. The bill also directs the Department of Environmental Quality to (i) identify any other states that have adopted the Criteria as of July 1, 2018; (ii) identify those procedures for the implementation of the Criteria that will minimize the impact of such implementation on Virginia sewerage systems while complying with the Clean Water Act; and (iii) report its findings to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources, the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources, the Senate Finance Committee, and the House Appropriations Committee by November 1, 2018. The bill provides that the inclusion of the implementation program in the Board's current regulatory action shall not require reproposal of the current action. This bill is identical to HB 1475.
Title
Sewerage systems; state adoption of federal criteria.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Peake reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Peake reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB344ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title replaced 18106964D-H1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House with substitute (93-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB344H1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106964D-H1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106964D-H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB344S2 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Substitute #2 by Senator Peake agreed to 18105302D-S2 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18105302D-S2 (Peake) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Substitute #1 by Senator Peake rejected 18105261D-S1 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Peake reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB344S1 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Peake agreed to 18105261D-S1 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18105261D-S1 (Peake) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103158D |