VA SB343 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0843)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School boards; employment of certain individuals. Permits any school board to employ an individual who, at the time of the individual's hiring, has been convicted of a felony, provided that such individual (i) was employed in good standing by a school board on or before December 17, 2015; (ii) has been granted a simple pardon for such offense by the Governor or other appropriate authority; and (iii) has had his civil rights restored by the Governor or other appropriate authority. The bill permits a school board to employ, until July 1, 2020, a person who does not satisfy the conditions set forth in clauses (ii) and (iii), provided that such person has been continuously employed by the school board from December 17, 2015, through July 1, 2018. This bill is identical to HB 1000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School boards; permitted to employ certain individuals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0843)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 843 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled bill text (SB343ER2)
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 3-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB343ER)
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled
2018-03-10HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
2018-03-10HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N)
2018-03-10SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10SenateConference substitute printed 18108162D-S3
2018-03-10 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Landes, Leftwich, Bagby
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08SenateSenators: Peake, Dunnavant, Barker
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08SenateSenate acceded to request (38-Y 2-N)
2018-03-07HouseHouse requested conference committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2018-03-06SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2018-03-06SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB343H1
2018-03-05HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107511D-H1
2018-03-05HouseRead third time
2018-03-02HouseRead second time
2018-02-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107511D-H1
2018-02-28HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-06SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2018-02-06SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2018-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB343S2
2018-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106437D-S2
2018-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-05SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18105948D-S1
2018-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-05SenateRead second time
2018-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106437D-S2
2018-01-31SenateIncorporates SB928 (Obenshain)
2018-01-31SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2018-01-25SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2018-01-25SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25SenateIncorporates SB928 (Obenshain)
2018-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 18105948D-S1
2018-01-17SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103141D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221296.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB343
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB343+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB343S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB343S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB343H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB343S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB343ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB343ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0843+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0070+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0229+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0263SB0343+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0313SB0343+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0314SB0343+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0315SB0343+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0903V0041+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0170+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1257+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0969SB0343+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1088SB0343+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1195SB0343+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1561+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1229SB0343+SB0343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1668+SB0343

Bill Comments

feedback