VA SB341 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer protection; online marketplace; high-volume third-party sellers. Establishes requirements for high-volume third-party sellers, defined in the bill as participants in an online marketplace that have entered into at least 200 discrete sales or transactions for 12 continuous months during the past 24 months resulting in accumulation of an aggregate total of $5,000 or more in gross revenues. The bill requires an online marketplace to (i) require high-volume third-party sellers to provide identifying and contact information to the online marketplace; (ii) verify the information provided by a high-volume third-party seller within 10 days of receipt; and (iii) require that high-volume third-party sellers make certain conspicuous disclosures to consumers on their product listing pages, with certain limited exceptions. The bill provides that the Attorney General has the exclusive authority to enforce its provisions and that any violation of its provisions is a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act. Consumer protection; online marketplace; high-volume third-party sellers. Establishes requirements for high-volume third-party sellers, defined in the bill as participants in an online marketplace that have entered into at least 200 discrete sales or transactions for 12 continuous months during the past 24 months resulting in accumulation of an aggregate total of $5,000 or more in gross revenues. The bill requires an online marketplace to (i) require high-volume third-party sellers to provide identifying and contact information to the online marketplace; (ii) verify the information provided by a high-volume third-party seller within 10 days of receipt; and (iii) require that high-volume third-party sellers make certain conspicuous disclosures to consumers on their product listing pages, with certain limited exceptions. The bill provides that the Attorney General has the exclusive authority to enforce its provisions and that any violation of its provisions is a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act.
Title
Consumer protection; online marketplace, high-volume third-party sellers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N 1-A) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (7-Y 3-N 5-A) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N 1-A) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (7-Y 3-N 5-A) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N 1-A) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB341S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104776D-S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104776D-S1 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (7-Y 3-N 5-A) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101756D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 589 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 592 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |