VA SB334 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Board for Court Reporters. Creates the Virginia Board for Court Reporters as an independent board to establish the qualification of applicants for licensure or registration of court reporters in the state. Beginning July 1, 2021, no person may engage in or offer to engage in work as a court reporter unless he has been licensed by the Board. The bill establishes principles of conduct for court reporters and creates the Board for Court Reporters Fund to receive licensing and registration fees to fund the licensure and registration program.
Title
Court Reporters, Virginia Board for; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20106667D-S1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103488D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 1000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4521 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |