VA SB334 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement of certain offenses. Allows a person to petition for expungement of a deferred disposition dismissal for underage alcohol possession or using a false ID to obtain alcohol when the offense occurred prior to the person's twenty-first birthday; all court costs, fines, and restitution have been paid; and the person seeking the expungement is at least 21 years of age and has no other alcohol-related convictions. The bill provides that any person seeking expungement of an alcohol-related charge shall be assessed a $150 fee, which shall be paid into the state treasury and credited to the Department of State Police. The provisions of the bill are contingent upon funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Underage alcohol possession, etc.; expungement of certain offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-03-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-03-02 | House | Referred from Appropriations by voice vote |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB334S2 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Peake agreed to 18107010D-S2 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18107010D-S2 (Peake) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 18106894D-S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106894D-S1 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100471D |