VA SB328 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Common Interest Community Board; disclosure packets; registration of associations. Requires the Common Interest Community Board to include information specifying the period or length of declarant control in its current one-page form that accompanies association disclosure packets that are required to be provided to all prospective purchasers of lots located within a development that is subject to the Virginia Property Owners' Association Act. With a delayed effective date of July 1, 2019, the bill also requires, unless control of the association of the development has been transferred to the members, that the developer register the association with the Common Interest Community Board within 30 days after recordation of the declaration and file required reports thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Common Interest Community Board; disclosure packets, registration of associations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 733 (effective - see bill)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB328ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-01HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB328S1
2018-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106237D-S1
2018-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-01SenateRead second time
2018-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106237D-S1
2018-01-29SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102447D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412350(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB328
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB328+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB328S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB328ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0733+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S12V0061+SB0328
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0235SB0328+SB0328
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0255SB0328+SB0328
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1102V0046+SB0328
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0273+SB0328
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1311+SB0328

Bill Comments

feedback