VA SB326 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB326

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Sentencing proceeding by the jury after conviction; recommendation of leniency. Provides that a jury may, in ascertaining the punishment for a person convicted of a felony or Class 1 misdemeanor, recommend that the sentence imposed be suspended in whole or in part, or that sentences imposed for multiple offenses be served concurrently, except where such suspension of sentence or concurrent service is prohibited by law. The bill prohibits the trial court from imposing an active term of incarceration in excess of the active term of incarceration recommended by the jury. Sentencing proceeding by the jury after conviction; recommendation of leniency. Provides that a jury may, in ascertaining the punishment for a person convicted of a felony or Class 1 misdemeanor, recommend that the sentence imposed be suspended in whole or in part, or that sentences imposed for multiple offenses be served concurrently, except where such suspension of sentence or concurrent service is prohibited by law. The bill prohibits the trial court from imposing an active term of incarceration in excess of the active term of incarceration recommended by the jury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing proceeding by the jury after conviction; recommendation of leniency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-02-24HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102165D-E
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB326E
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-05SenateReported from Judiciary with amendment (10-Y 3-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102165D

Same As/Similar To

SB326 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192295.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB326
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB326+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB326E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB326AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB326F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB326FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03C0252+SB0326
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05C0225+SB0326
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0457SB0326+SB0326
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0528SB0326+SB0326
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0543SB0326+SB0326

Bill Comments

feedback