VA SB325 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0648)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Veterans Services. Provides the Secretary of Veterans and Defense Affairs (the Secretary) with greater direct oversight of the Department of Veterans Services (the Department). The bill requires (i) that the current cost-benefit and value analysis of existing programs and services and for new programs and services before they are established and implemented be conducted annually, with the results provided to the Secretary, and (ii) that the Department submit an annual report through the Secretary to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1 of each year. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Services, Department of; oversight of Department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0648)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 648 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB325ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-01HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101227D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222000(n/a)See Bill Text
222000.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222001(n/a)See Bill Text
222001.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222004(n/a)See Bill Text
224310.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback