VA SB32 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Peanut Board; commodity assessment. Authorizes the Peanut Board to enter into an agreement with the Federal Commodity Credit Corporation and to increase the commodity assessment from $0.15 per 100 pounds to $0.30 per 100 pounds for a three-year period beginning July 1, 2010. The commodity assessment is paid by peanut growers.
Title
Peanut Board; authorized to enter into an agreement with Federal Commodity Credit Corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0037) | |
2010-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 37 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB32ER) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-19 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB32S1 | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104128D-S1 | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104128D-S1 | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103263D |
Same As/Similar To
HB888 (Same As) 2010-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 1904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 1907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |