VA SB315 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
Summary
Office of the Children's Ombudsman. Creates the Office of the Children's Ombudsman to provide ombudsman services, including investigation of complaints, advocacy, and the provision of information for children, parents, and citizens involved with child-serving agencies. The bill is identical to
Title
Children's Ombudsman, Office of; created, report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 698 (effective - see bill) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB315ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-28 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 082399228-ES1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB315ES1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 082399228-S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Edwards rejected 082416228-S4 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Edwards withdrawn 082415228-S3 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Edwards withdrawn 082415228-S2 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 082416228-S4 (Edwards) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 082415228-S3 (Edwards) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 082415228-S2 (Edwards) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Committee amendment rejected | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 082399228-S1 | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (9-Y 7-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 082399228-S1 | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088531874 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB315 |