VA SB313 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia College Building Authority; projects; participating institutions. Permits any organization that is exempt from federal income taxation pursuant to § 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code and that is owned or controlled by a public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth or whose purpose is to support or otherwise benefit a public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth to finance projects through the Virginia College Building Authority.
Title
Virginia College Building Authority; financing projects, participating institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 658 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB313ER) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100739D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1012 (Same As) 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)