VA SB312 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Postrelease incarceration of felons sentenced for certain offenses. Clarifies that offenders who are convicted of knowingly failing to register or reregister with, or knowingly providing materially false information to, the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry are subject to added terms of postrelease incarceration. The bill also clarifies that when a sentence is imposed upon conviction of a felony that includes an active term of incarceration and the court does not order a suspended term of confinement of at least six months, a period of postrelease incarceration shall be imposed that is not less than six months or more than three years. The bill also clarifies that it is the period of postrelease incarceration that is required to be suspended, not the period of postrelease supervision. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Judicial Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Felons; postrelease incarceration of offenders sentenced for certain offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-04SenateSigned by President
2020-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-03SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB312ER)
2020-03-03SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26SenateTitle replaced 20108509D-H1
2020-02-26SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB312H1
2020-02-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108509D-H1
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108509D-H1
2020-02-19HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101432D

Same As/Similar To

HB752 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192295.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB312&201+sum+SB312
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB312+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB312H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB312ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0263+SB0312
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0591SB0312+SB0312
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0592SB0312+SB0312
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0593SB0312+SB0312
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0165+SB0312
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0362+SB0312
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1299+SB0312
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1002SB0312+SB0312

Bill Comments

feedback