VA SB31 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Interstate 73 Corridor Development Fund and Program. Establishes the Interstate 73 Corridor Development Fund and Program and reallocates to the I-73 Fund the $40 million from state recordation taxes that is currently allocated annually to the U.S. Route 58 Corridor Development Fund and Program. All provisions of the bill are contingent upon construction of and payments for Route 58 being completed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate 73 Corridor Development Fund and Program; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-14HouseRead first time
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-09SenateRead third time and passed Senate (24-Y 13-N)
2018-02-08SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateReported from Finance (13-Y 2-N 1-A)
2017-11-20SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-11-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100248D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3321700(n/a)See Bill Text
3321709(n/a)See Bill Text
3322300(n/a)See Bill Text
3322301(n/a)See Bill Text
3323400(n/a)See Bill Text
3323401(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback