VA SB307 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Kinship foster care; notice and appeal. Requires local boards of social services (local boards), upon receiving a request from a child's relative to become a kinship foster parent, to provide the relative with any forms and materials that must be submitted to become a kinship foster parent within 15 days. The bill requires local boards, upon denying a relative's request to become a kinship foster parent, to provide to the relative (i) a clear and specific explanation of the reasons for denial, (ii) a statement that such denial is appealable, and (iii) information regarding the procedure for filing such appeal. The bill allows relatives to file an appeal regarding such decisions with the Commissioner of Social Services and requires the Board of Social Services to adopt certain regulations regarding the timeline of such appeals.
Title
Kinship foster care; notice and appeal.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 562 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB307ER) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title replaced 22106880D-H1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB307H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106880D-H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106880D-H1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22100568D-E |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB307E |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Mason agreed to |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100568D |
Same As/Similar To
HB716 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
HB716 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
HB716 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Foster Care
Social Services Board of or Department of
Welfare (Social Services)
Foster Care
Social Services Board of or Department of
Welfare (Social Services)