VA SB305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health; cognitive impairment. Directs the Department of Health, in partnership with the Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Commission, the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services, and the Alzheimer's Association, to incorporate in its existing, relevant public health outreach programs information (i) to educate health care providers on the importance of early detection and timely diagnosis of cognitive impairment, validated cognitive assessment tools, the value of a Medicare Annual Wellness visit for cognitive health, and the new Medicare care planning billing code for individuals with cognitive impairment and (ii) to increase understanding and awareness of early warning signs of Alzheimer's disease and other types of dementia, the value of early detection and diagnosis, and how to reduce the risk of cognitive decline, particularly among persons in diverse communities who are at greater risk of developing Alzheimer's disease and other types of dementia. This bill incorporates SB 327.
Title
Cognitive impairment; VDH to include certain information in its public health outreach programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 468 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB305ER) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB305S1 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105493D-S1 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105493D-S1 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Incorporates SB327 (Ruff) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 18102052D |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102052D |