VA SB305 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0252)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0252)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; required notices related to the handling of asbestos. Requires the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation to provide with every asbestos worker's license a notice, in English and Spanish, containing a summary of the basic worker safety procedures regarding the handling of asbestos and information on how to file a complaint with the Virginia Board for Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.
Title
DPOR; notices in English and Spanish regarding handling of asbestos.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 77 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0252) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 252 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 8, 2016 | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/1/16 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB305ER) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House (75-Y 25-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 3-N 2-A) |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103224D |