VA SB304 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB304

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Animal shelter euthanasia rate. Requires any public or private animal shelter or releasing agency to annually file with the State Veterinarian (i) a copy of its intake policy, (ii) the number of animals on which a euthanasia procedure was performed, and (iii) of such number, the number of animals (a) surrendered with the intent to euthanize and (b) presented by the public animal shelter to a licensed veterinarian prior to euthanasia. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal shelters; euthanasia rate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseContinued to 2021 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20107720D-ES2
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment SB304ES2
2020-02-11SenateAmendment by Senator Barker agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateSubstitute by Senator Stanley agreed to 20107720D-S2
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20107280D-S1
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateFloor substitute printed 20107720D-S2 (Stanley)
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-04SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107280D-S1
2020-01-21SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
2020-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100786D

Same As/Similar To

SB304 (Carry Over) 2020-02-26 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325906(n/a)See Bill Text
326546(n/a)See Bill Text
5413423(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB304
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB304+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB304S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB304S2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB304ES2+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB304AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB304ASR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB304F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB304FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB304FES2122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S01C0049+SB0304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05C0209+SB0304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0457SB0304+SB0304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0520SB0304+SB0304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0521SB0304+SB0304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0522SB0304+SB0304
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0523SB0304+SB0304

Bill Comments

feedback