VA SB304 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency medical services vehicles; temporary permit. Provides that a temporary permit for an emergency medical services vehicle that does not meet required standards is valid for a period of 90 days from the end of the month of issue. Under current law, such permit is valid for a period not to exceed 60 days.
Title
Emergency medical services vehicles; temporary permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 279 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB304ER) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102350D |