VA SB303 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Import and sale of dogs from certain breeders; penalty. Prohibits any dealer or commercial dog breeder from importing for sale, selling, or offering for sale any dog bred by a person who has received certain citations pursuant to enforcement of the federal Animal Welfare Act. A violation is a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Dogs; import and sale from certain breeders, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 569 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB303ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99--Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Assigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals |
2020-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100785D |