VA SB297 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Stay of debt collection activities by health care providers; prohibited practice under Virginia Consumer Protection Act. Provides that any health care provider that undertakes any debt collection activities prior to either the issuance of an award or the determination that a claim is noncompensable by the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund has committed a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act. Stay of debt collection activities by health care providers; prohibited practice under Virginia Consumer Protection Act. Provides that any health care provider that undertakes any debt collection activities prior to either the issuance of an award or the determination that a claim is noncompensable by the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund has committed a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act.
Title
Health care providers; stay of debt collection activities, prohibited practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB297ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendment (91-Y 7-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (18-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 7-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100542D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 368.5:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |