VA SB295 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Roanoke Higher Education Authority; board of trustees; membership. Removes the presidents of Hollins University and Roanoke College from and adds the president of Virginia Commonwealth University to the board of trustees of the Roanoke Higher Education Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Roanoke Higher Education Authority; board of trustees, membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140)
2018-03-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 140 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
2018-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
2018-02-23SenateSigned by President
2018-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-21SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB295ER)
2018-02-21SenateEnrolled
2018-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseRead third time
2018-02-16HouseRead second time
2018-02-14HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-01-23HouseRead first time
2018-01-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-17SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16SenatePassed by for the day
2018-01-16SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-15SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-11SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103801D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2313117(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB295
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB295+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB295ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0140+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0004+SB0295
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0015SB0295+SB0295
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0038SB0295+SB0295
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0040SB0295+SB0295
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0044SB0295+SB0295
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0142+SB0295
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0804+SB0295

Bill Comments

feedback