VA SB294 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retaliatory actions by state officers and employees against persons providing testimony before a committee or subcommittee of the General Assembly. Prohibits officers and employees of a state agency from retaliating or threatening to retaliate against a person for providing testimony before a committee or subcommittee of the General Assembly. The bill provides that to be covered, a person who provides testimony before a committee or subcommittee of the General Assembly shall do so in good faith and upon a reasonable belief that the information is accurate. Testimony that is reckless or that the person knew or should have known was false, confidential, malicious, or otherwise prohibited by law or policy shall not be deemed good faith testimony. Under the bill, an intentional violation by an officer or employee of a state agency constitutes malfeasance in office. The bill also provides that any person who believes that he is the subject of retaliatory action may file a complaint with the Office of the Inspector General and expands the authority of the Office to include receiving and investigating such complaints.
Title
State officers & employees; retaliatory actions against persons providing certain testimony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 628 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB294ER) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendments (96-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-03-07 | House | Amendments by Delegate Knight agreed to |
2016-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103382D |