VA SB293 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Reckless driving causing death or injury of certain persons. Punishes reckless driving or a violation of the "move-over" law that causes death or permanent and significant physical impairment by striking a law-enforcement officer, emergency medical services personnel, highway worker, firefighter, or a DMV size and weight compliance agent who was not in a vehicle and on a public roadway or work zone engaged in his duties as a Class 5 felony with a $2,500 mandatory minimum fine. The bill further requires the court to suspend the offender's driver's license for one year. In addition, the court may impose a civil penalty of up to $10,000 and the proceeds shall be deposited into the general fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reckless driving; causing death or injury of certain persons, Class 5 felony.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-26HouseContinued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2014-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2014-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N)
2014-02-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2014-02-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2014-02-12HouseRead first time
2014-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-02-07SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2014-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB293S1
2014-02-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 14104472D-S1
2014-02-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2014-02-06SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2014-02-06SenateReading of amendments waived
2014-02-06SenateRead second time
2014-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2014-02-04SenateReported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
2014-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance
2014-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 14104472D-S1
2014-01-27SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2014-01-15SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2014-01-15SenateReported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2014-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2014-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100631D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462867.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback