VA SB290 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Solar-ready roofs for certain government buildings; net-zero energy consumption building design for schools. Requires any executive branch agency or institution and any locality entering the design phase for the construction of a new building greater than 5,000 gross square feet in size, or the renovation of a building where the cost of the renovation exceeds 50 percent of the value of the building, to ensure that such building includes a solar-ready, cool, or energy-efficient roof, defined in the bill. However, the provisions of the bill do not apply to localities with a population of less than 100,000 until July 1, 2023. The bill also requires new public school buildings and facilities and improvements and renovations to existing public school buildings and facilities where the cost of the renovation exceeds 50 percent of the value of the building to, after notice is given to the governing body, be designed, constructed, maintained, and operated to generate more electricity than consumed. The provisions of this bill only apply to projects entering the design phase on or after January 1, 2023. Solar-ready roofs for certain government buildings; net-zero energy consumption building design for schools. Requires any executive branch agency or institution and any locality entering the design phase for the construction of a new building greater than 5,000 gross square feet in size, or the renovation of a building where the cost of the renovation exceeds 50 percent of the value of the building, to ensure that such building includes a solar-ready, cool, or energy-efficient roof, defined in the bill. However, the provisions of the bill do not apply to localities with a population of less than 100,000 until July 1, 2023. The bill also requires new public school buildings and facilities and improvements and renovations to existing public school buildings and facilities where the cost of the renovation exceeds 50 percent of the value of the building to, after notice is given to the governing body, be designed, constructed, maintained, and operated to generate more electricity than consumed. The provisions of this bill only apply to projects entering the design phase on or after January 1, 2023.
Title
State agencies and localities; solar-ready roof requirements, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (10-Y 12-N) (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (10-Y 12-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Failed to refer to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB290S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106369D-S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106369D-S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 6-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103777D |