VA SB286 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Required disclosure for buyer to beware; buyer due diligence; historic districts. Adds a survey of the property to the list of materials that a purchaser of the property can review as part of exercising whatever due diligence the particular purchaser deems necessary with respect to a historic district designated by the locality. Required disclosure for buyer to beware; buyer due diligence; historic districts. Adds a survey of the property to the list of materials that a purchaser of the property can review as part of exercising whatever due diligence the particular purchaser deems necessary with respect to a historic district designated by the locality.
Title
Historic districts; required disclosure for buyer to beware, due diligence.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB286ER) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Title replaced 22106895D-H1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House with substitute (89-Y 8-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB286H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106895D-H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-09 | House | Reconsideration of pass by agreed to |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106895D-H1 |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22100713D-E |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB286E |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Ebbin agreed to |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100713D |