VA SB285 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - House: Tabled in Transportation (11-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Unpaved secondary road fund. Provides that in any year in which the Commonwealth Transportation Board has not allocated funding for nonsurface treated secondary roads, no penalty will be applied to transfers of funding from unpaved roads to other secondary road projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unpaved secondary road fund; use of proceeds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-23 - House - House: Tabled in Transportation (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-23 House: Tabled in Transportation (11-Y 10-N)
2010-02-22 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N)
2010-02-19 House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1
2010-02-17 House: Referred to Committee on Transportation
2010-02-17 House: Read first time
2010-02-17 House: Placed on Calendar
2010-02-16 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2010-02-16 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2010-02-16 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB285S1
2010-02-16 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105147D-S1
2010-02-16 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2010-02-16 Senate: Read second time
2010-02-15 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2010-02-11 Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105147D-S1
2010-02-11 Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2010-01-12 Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation
2010-01-12 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101217D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33123.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback