VA SB282 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Shoreline Resiliency Fund. Establishes the Virginia Shoreline Resiliency Fund for the purpose of creating a low-interest loan program to help residents and businesses that are subject to recurrent flooding. Moneys from the Fund may be used to mitigate future flood damage.
Title
Virginia Shoreline Resiliency Fund; established, annual audit of Virginia Resources Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 7-N) (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762) | |
2016-04-20 | House | Enacted, Chapter 762 (effective 7/1/16) |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB282ER2) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 7-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (84-Y 7-N) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 3-N) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB282ER) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed House (84-Y 14-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB282S1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104854D-S1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104854D-S1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101182D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 603.24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 603.27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |