VA SB28 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; powers and duties; policies regarding cell phones and other handheld communication devices. Permits each school board to develop and implement a policy to prohibit the possession or use of cell phones and other handheld communication devices during regular school hours.
Title
School boards; powers and duties, policies regarding cell phones and other handheld devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Left in Education |
2024-03-05 | House | Rereferred to Education |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported from Education (19-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101810D |