VA SB279 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; criteria for determining need. Makes clear that in determining whether a public need for a proposed project has been demonstrated the State Health Commissioner shall consider the impact of the proposed project on all people to whom services may be provided and not only residents of the service area.
Title
Certificate of public need; criteria for determining need.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 227 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB279ER) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Certificate of Public Need |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103906D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1549 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)