VA SB278 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0842)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Eminent domain proceedings; payment of funds to owner or attorney. Requires that any funds due to the owner, whether such funds are in the possession of the court or are outstanding, shall be payable to the owner or, with consent of the owner, to the owner's attorney within 30 days of a settlement or final determination in an eminent domain proceeding. The bill further provides that the payment provision does not alter the priority of liens or any obligation to satisfy or release any outstanding liens on the property or the funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent domain proceedings; distribution of funds to owner or owner's attorney.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0842)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 842 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled bill text (SB278ER2)
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's substitute printed 18108394D-S3
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB278ER)
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled
2018-03-09SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HousePassed by temporarily
2018-03-08SenateConference substitute printed 18108105D-S2
2018-03-08 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-07HouseDelegates: Gilbert, Miyares, Mullin
2018-03-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-06SenateSenators: Petersen, Obenshain, Deeds
2018-03-06SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-06SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseHouse requested conference committee
2018-03-05HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2018-03-02SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB278H1
2018-02-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107397D-H1
2018-02-28HouseRead third time
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107397D-H1
2018-02-23HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB278S1
2018-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18105892D-S1
2018-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-31SenateRead second time
2018-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 18105892D-S1
2018-01-29SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-05SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104221D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251247.1(n/a)See Bill Text
251310(n/a)See Bill Text
3321027.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB278
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB278+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB278S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB278H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB278S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB278ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB278S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB278ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0842+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0204+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0224SB0278+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0240SB0278+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0802V0113+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0563+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1145+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0843SB0278+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0966SB0278+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1529+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1162SB0278+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1228SB0278+SB0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1667+SB0278

Bill Comments

feedback