VA SB277 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0374)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0374)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Transportation Commission; membership. Increases the number of nonlegislative citizen members of the Northern Virginia Transportation Commission from 13 to 14 by increasing from one to two the members who represent Loudoun County.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation Commission; increases membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0374) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 374 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB277ER) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-25 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102452D |
Same As/Similar To
HB181 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)