VA SB27 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Warranty registration cards. Prohibits a seller from conditioning the coverage or performance of a warranty, in connection with the sale of personal, family, or household goods, upon the purchaser's returning a warranty registration card, or from providing that the duration of a warranty is dependent upon the return of a warranty registration card. These prohibitions do not apply if the requirement that the purchaser return a warranty registration card is conspicuously disclosed in any advertising and marketing materials that reference the goods' warranty. A seller may use warranty registration cards as a suggested method of proof of the date the goods were purchased. A violation constitutes a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act.
Title
Warranty registration cards; prohibits seller from conditioning coverage or performance of warranty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713) | |
2010-04-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 713 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB27ER) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-23 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100693D |