VA SB266 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (16-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (16-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; exception. Authorizes the State Health Commissioner (Commissioner) to accept and review applications and issue a certificate of public need for new neonatal care services in Planning District 5, new ambulatory surgery centers in Planning District 15 and 23, and new magnetic resonance imaging services in Planning District 8 and 23, provided that certain conditions are met. The bill also prohibits the establishment, between July 1, 2018 and July 1, 2019, of a facility that includes a dedicated emergency department that is subject to the requirements of the federal Emergency Medical Treatment and Labor Act (42 U.S.C. ?§1395dd) if such facility would be located within 20 miles of an affiliated licensed hospital that is under common ownership with such facility. This bill incorporates SB 235, SB 354, SB 365, SB 806, SB 848, and SB 923.
Title
Certificate of public need; establishment of certain surgery centers, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. David Suetterlein [R] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] |
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. John Petersen [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Passed by indefinitely in Health, Welfare and Institutions (16-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB266S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106951D-S1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Incorporates SB923 (Dunnavant) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Incorporates SB848 (Cosgrove) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Incorporates SB806 (Petersen) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Incorporates SB365 (Spruill) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Incorporates SB354 (McClellan) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Incorporates SB235 (DeSteph) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106951D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101585D |