VA SB266 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
FAMIS eligibility. Changes the eligibility for the Family Access to Medical Insurance Security Plan from children in families with an income at or below 200 percent of the federal poverty level to those with an income at or below 225 percent of the federal poverty level. The provisions of this act will only become effective upon an appropriation of funds effectuating the purposes of the act passed by the 2010 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
FAMIS Plan; eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-25 | House: Continued to 2011 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10100982D-E | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB266E | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100982D |