VA SB265 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Language development for children who are deaf or hard of hearing; assessment resources for parents and educators; advisory committee; report. Requires the Department of Education, in coordination with the Department for the Deaf and Hard-of-Hearing and Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to (i) select, with input from an advisory committee that the bill establishes, language developmental milestones and include such milestones in a resource for use by parents of a child from birth to age five who is identified as deaf or hard of hearing to monitor and track their child's expressive and receptive language acquisition and developmental stages toward English literacy; (ii) disseminate such resource to such parents; (iii) select existing tools or assessments for educators for use in assessing the language and literacy development of children from birth to age five who are deaf or hard of hearing; (iv) disseminate such tools or assessments to local educational agencies and provide materials and training on their use; and (v) annually produce a report that compares the language and literacy development of children from birth to age five who are deaf or hard of hearing with the language and literacy development of their peers who are not deaf or hard of hearing and make such report available to the public on its website. The bill states that the advisory committee function shall terminate effective June 30, 2023.
Title
Children who are deaf or hard of hearing; language development, assessment resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0240) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 240 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB265ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title replaced 22106920D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB265H1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106920D-H1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106920D-H1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB265S3 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Hashmi agreed to 22106550D-S3 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 22106322D-S2 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 22105891D-S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 22106550D-S3 (Hashmi) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106322D-S2 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105891D-S1 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104072D |
Same As/Similar To
HB649 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
HB649 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)
HB649 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)