VA SB264 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certified registered nurse anesthetists; prescriptive authority. Authorizes certified registered nurse anesthetists to prescribe Schedule II through Schedule VI controlled substances and devices to a patient requiring anesthesia, as part of the periprocedural care of the patient, provided that such prescribing is in accordance with requirements for practice by certified registered nurse anesthetists and is done under the supervision of a doctor of medicine, osteopathy, podiatry, or dentistry.
Title
Certified registered nurse anesthetists; prescriptive authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 161 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB264ER) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102284D-E |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB264E |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102284D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1059 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)