VA SB263 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-27 - House: Tabled in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-27 - House: Tabled in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Summary
Retrieving hunting dogs. Requires the revocation of the hunting license for the current and the next hunting seasons and allows the forfeiture of the firearm or bow and arrow of any person who is convicted of carrying such weapons and hunting on another person's property while he is retrieving his hunting dogs, which will be a Class 2 misdemeanor. In addition refusal to identify oneself when requested by the landowner to do so is raised from a Class 4 to a Class 2 misdemeanor.
Title
Hunting dogs; carrying weapons on another person's property to retrieve prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-27 | House: Tabled in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 083911220-E | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB263E | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-10 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083911220 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB263 |