VA SB261 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB261
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia STEM Education Advisory Board; comprehensive review of labor statistics categories; report. Directs the Virginia Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) Education Advisory Board (the Board) to perform a comprehensive review of U.S. Bureau of Labor Statistics categories within the standard occupational classification system and assess deficit areas that do not capture Virginia's existing STEM+C (Computing) workforce profile for the purpose of better aligning K-12 and higher education priorities. The Board shall report its findings to the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority Office of Education and Labor Market Alignment and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology no later than October 1, 2022.
Title
Virginia STEM Education Advisory Board; comprehensive review of labor statistics categories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101764D |
Same As/Similar To
SB261 (Carry Over) 2022-02-09 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Education
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Education
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation