VA SB26 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Method of nominating party candidates; certain incumbents to determine method. Provides that incumbent constitutional officers shall have the right to determine the method of making party nominations for that constitutional office. If the incumbent constitutional officer does not designate a method or if no incumbent offers as a candidate for reelection to the office, the political party shall determine the method of nomination for that office. Currently, only incumbent General Assembly members have the right to designate the method of nomination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nominating party candidates; certain incumbents to determine method.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (18-Y 22-N) (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12SenateDefeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
2018-02-12SenateReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateRead third time and defeated by Senate (18-Y 22-N)
2018-02-12SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-02-09SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N)
2017-11-20SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-11-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100042D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242509(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback