VA SB259 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; performance and payment bonds. Requires a performance bond and payment bond to be furnished by the contractor for all nontransportation-related public construction contracts that exceed $500,000 and all transportation-related projects that exceed $350,000 and are partially or wholly funded by the Commonwealth. Current law only requires these bonds for certain types of contracts. Virginia Public Procurement Act; performance and payment bonds. Requires a performance bond and payment bond to be furnished by the contractor for all nontransportation-related public construction contracts that exceed $500,000 and all transportation-related projects that exceed $350,000 and are partially or wholly funded by the Commonwealth. Current law only requires these bonds for certain types of contracts.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; performance and payment bonds.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0565) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 565 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB259ER) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Title replaced 22107007D-H1 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB259H1 |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107007D-H1 |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107007D-H1 |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101398D |