VA SB259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; library records. Clarifies that information contained in library records that can be used to identify any library patron who has borrowed or accessed material or resources from a library as well as the material or resources such patron borrowed or accessed is exempt from disclosure under the Virginia Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; excludes library records.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 587 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB259ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102400D |
Same As/Similar To
HB313 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)