VA SB256 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Military Affairs; recruitment. Authorizes the Department of Military Affairs to utilize grant funding to recruit qualified applicants for service in the Virginia National Guard. The bill states that the yearly funding amount for such recruitment shall be at the discretion of the Adjutant General and the Department of Military Affairs and not exceed $50,000 per fiscal year.
Title
Virginia National Guard; Dept. of Military Affairs may utilize grant funding to recruit.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 691 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB256ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title replaced 22106811D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB256H1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106811D-H1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106811D-H1 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB256S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106182D-S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106182D-S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102443D |
Same As/Similar To
HB210 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748)
HB210 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748)
HB210 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748)
Subjects
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Virginia National Guard
Virginia National Guard