VA SB255 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB255
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Continued to 2023 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Continued to 2023 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning; wireless communications infrastructure; application process. Provides that in its consideration of certain communications infrastructure applications, a locality shall not disapprove an application if (i) the proposed new structure provides additional wireless coverage or capacity for first responders or (ii) the proposed tower is not within a four-mile radius of an existing tower that is part of the applicant's network. Additional changes in the bill provide that a locality shall not be prohibited from disapproving certain applications for any zoning approval required for non-administrative review-eligible projects on the basis of the fact that the proposed height of any wireless support structure, wireless facility, or wireless support structure with attached wireless facilities exceeds 200 feet above ground level. Current law sets the limit at 50 feet above ground level.
Title
Zoning; wireless communications infrastructure, application process.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Recommitted to Local Government |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105096D-S1 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103784D |
Same As/Similar To
SB255 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Continued to 2023 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)